+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (11-Y 11-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Incorporates HB609
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101929D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2020: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (11-Y 11-N)
January 31, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
January 31, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Michael P. Mullin
Type:
Primary Sponsor