+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 12105034D-H1
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #1
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100678D
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2012: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
February 1, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor