+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106064D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB670H1
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106064D-H1
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred from Education by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102285D
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2018: Continued to 2019 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor