+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0893)
On May 19, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 893 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (38-Y 60-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (38-Y 60-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB670ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 988438747-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 988438747-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Committee substitute printed 988438747-S1
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Emergency clause deleted
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 983068480-E
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (29-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause 983068480
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations