+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 1, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 689 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB669ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985473424-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985473424-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 0-N 3-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (36-Y 0-N 3-A)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 985473424-S1
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Consent to introduce
- Presented & ordered printed 983298424
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Votes (7)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (36-Y 0-N 3-A)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor