+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 4, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0401)
On March 31, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 401 (effective 3/31/96)
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB668ER)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (91-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 967814252-EH1
- Reengrossed by House - com. sub. w/amd. 967814252-EH1
- Amendment by Mr. Moss agreed to
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 967814252-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 967814252-H1
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 967814252-H1
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 966578252
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: Reported from Finance with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (96)
Type:
Primary Sponsor