+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On April 27, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB665ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Williams rejected (15-Y 23-N 2-A)
- VOTE: FLOOR SUB. WILLIAMS V (15-Y 23-N 2-A)
- Reconsider committee amendments agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (90-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N)
- Title replaced
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments rejected
- Read third time
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed by for the day
- Floor substitute printed 988466739-S1 (Williams)
- Substitute by Sen. Williams offered
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Civil & Property Law
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 988360837-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mr. Deeds agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (20-Y 3-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 988360837
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR SUB. WILLIAMS V (15-Y 23-N 2-A)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 12, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from C. J. with amendments (20-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor