+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (42-Y 55-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (42-Y 55-N)
- Communicated to Governor
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB665ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Committee amendment rejected
- Floor substitute printed 18107741D-S1 (Chafin)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Chafin agreed to 18107741D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB665S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107741D-S1 (59-Y 36-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 36-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (10-Y 4-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (59-Y 41-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 41-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB665E
- Printed as engrossed 18104623D-E
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104623D
- Referred to Committee on Finance