+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2011 in Finance (14-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N)
- Read third time and passed House (63-Y 35-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (15-Y 6-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101938D
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2010: Continued to 2011 in Finance (14-Y 1-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (63-Y 35-N)
February 12, 2010: Reported from Appropriations (15-Y 6-N)
February 8, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor