+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 12 (effective 7/1/00)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB664ER)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 005852952-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Nat. Res. w/amds (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 005852952