+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (61)
On May 15, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0840)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB664ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 840 (effective - see bill)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 3, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB664ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate sub. w/amds. agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 988448112-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Stolle agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. w/amds. 988448112-S1
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds. (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 988448112-S1
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rereferred by Fin. (17-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-com: Criminal Law and Procedure
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 988433112-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 988433112-H1
- Amendments by Mr. Almand agreed to
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds. 988433112-EH1
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 988433112-EH1
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983724825
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rereferred by Fin. (17-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor