+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0297)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 297 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB663ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N)
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088329596
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2008: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
February 1, 2008: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor