+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 371 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0371)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB663ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106839D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB663H1
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106839D-H1
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101588D
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor