+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 738 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB662ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106616D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB662H1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106616D-H1
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103558D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor