+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- No further action taken
- Failed to pass
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: McDougle, Reeves, Peake
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Murphy, Bell, Robert B., Habeeb
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 1-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107909D-S1 (0-Y 97-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107909D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB661S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107909D-S1
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103526D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice