+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 54 (effective 7/1/98)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB660ER)
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 981903836-E
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (29-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Consent to introduce
- Presented & ordered printed 981903836
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations