+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 27, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 599 (effective 1/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB66ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 984334629-E
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (24-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/05/98 984334629
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with amd. (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor