+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 23 (effective 7/1/02)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB66ER)
On February 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N)
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 17, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 021178932-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Brink agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 15, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 11, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (20-Y 1-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/17/01 021178932
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 8, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2002: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N)
January 17, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
January 11, 2002: Reported from P. & E. w/amendments (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor