+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0903)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 903 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (46-Y 53-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (46-Y 53-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB653ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (28-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982155128
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (46-Y 53-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (28-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from Education (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor