+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 26, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0906)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 26-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 906 (effective 7/1/94)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (2-Y 93-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (72-Y 26-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 93-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB647ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD8226112 (HB647E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 93-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 26-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1994: Reported from R. & S. S. w/amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor