+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0446)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 446 (effective 7/1/16)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB645ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB645H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104828D-H1
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16104828D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103321D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2016: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor