+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed to LIS only printed 20108363D-S1
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N 1-A)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 20104045D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB644E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 9-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104045D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2020: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2020: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N 1-A)
February 5, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Chris L. Hurst
Type:
Primary Sponsor