+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 290 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB643ER)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB643E
- Emergency clause deleted
- Printed as engrossed 043804200-E
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Pres. & ord. printed w/emg. clause pref.01/13/04 043804200