+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 19, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0925)
On May 18, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 925 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED (36-Y 61-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (36-Y 61-N)
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB64ER)
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (91-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB64S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 065382824-S1
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 065382824-S1
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N)
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB64H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 067717488-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 067717488-H1
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (17-Y 4-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: #2 FOIA/Procurement (Marshall, D.)
On December 15, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 068738472