+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 813 (effective 7/1/14)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (0-Y 96-N)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 6, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB638ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 0-N 3-A)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB638H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104550D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104550D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101962D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 23, 2014: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
February 27, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 0-N 3-A)
January 30, 2014: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor