+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 56 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB637ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 12103634D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB637E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103634D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2012: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2012: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor