+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rerefer. by R.&S.S. (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985979198-E
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985979198
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rerefer. by R.&S.S. (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with amd. (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor