+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0141)
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 141 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB632ER)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 961177256
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1996: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor