+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 21, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Bill became law, Chapter 819 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE - ENROLLED BILL (36-Y 2-N)
- Passed in enrolled form (36-Y 2-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N)
- Passed in enrolled form (80-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (8-Y 89-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (8-Y 89-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB63ER)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 4-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (33-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Sen. K. G. Miller agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment rejected
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amd. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
- Recommitted to Transportation
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 7-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from R. & I. N. (15-Y 5-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to R. & I. N. sub-committee: 4
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 18-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE - ENROLLED BILL (36-Y 2-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (8-Y 89-N)
March 4, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
March 2, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (33-Y 4-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: Reported from Transportation w/amd. (14-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1994: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N)
February 1, 1994: Reported from R. & I. N. (15-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor