+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 335 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB628ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Motion to recommit to committee rejected (19-Y 21-N)
- Motion to reconsider motion to recommit to committee agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Chair votes Yes
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102348D
+ − Votes (11)
February 25, 2016: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (20-Y 20-N)
February 25, 2016: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 25, 2016: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (19-Y 21-N)
February 25, 2016: Motion to reconsider motion to recommit to committee agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 24, 2016: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 5-N 1-A)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor