+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 7, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0316)
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 316 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB628ER)
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 002800904-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Del. Reid agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 002800904
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2000: Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor