+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossment refused by House
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: #3 Special Subcommittee on Energy
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103863D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 11, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor