+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 726 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB622ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 081568440-S1 (99-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB622S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 081568440-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 081568440-S1
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086611440
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2008: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2008: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor