+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 138 (effective 3/15/04)
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB622ER)
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB622H1
- Emergency clause added
- Committee substitute agreed to 041797296-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 041797296-H1
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 044019448