+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Appropriations (28-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments #1-11 & 13 agreed to
- Title replaced
- Committee amendment #12 rejected
- Amendments #1 & 2 by Mr Woodrum agreed to
- Amendment # 3 by Mr. Woodrum agreed to
- Amendment # 4 by Mr. Woodrum agreed to
- Amendment # 5 by Mr. Woodrum agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Printed as engrossed 987603492-E
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (19-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987603492
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions