+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 517 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB620ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 3-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 10101588D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB620E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101588D