+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 6, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 727 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB62ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 14100985D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB62E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On December 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100985D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
February 7, 2014: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor