+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0209)
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 209 (effective 3/16/96)
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB62ER)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to L. G. sub-committee: Charters
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 961312128-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Emergency clause added
- Amendments by Mr. Bennett agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 961312128
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1996: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1996: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor