+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104133D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws