+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0409)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 409 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB617ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 11-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105130D-S1 (88-Y 11-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 18-N 1-A)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105130D-S1 (75-Y 18-N 1-A)
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105130D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB617S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14105130D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 5-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103193D
+ − Votes (8)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 11-N)
February 25, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 18-N 1-A)
February 21, 2014: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
January 27, 2014: Reported from Finance (17-Y 5-N)
January 22, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor