+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 175 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB616ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 087075250-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB616E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087075250
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor