+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 19, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0785)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 785 (effective 7/1/94)
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 2, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB615ER)
On March 14, 1994 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed LD7981400 (HB615H1)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONF. REPORT (40-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 4-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- Substitute recommended by conference committee
- VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 4-N)
On March 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Holland, R.J., Holland, E.M., Stosch
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 89-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 89-N)
- House acceded to request
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Phillips, Heilig, Parrish
On March 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7226605 (HB615S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD7082400 (HB615E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Cunningham agreed to
- Amendment by Del. Orrock agreed to
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT CONF. REPORT (40-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 4-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 89-N)
March 10, 1994: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 1-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor