+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0083)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 83 (effective 7/1/96)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB615ER)
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 966934296-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 966934296-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 966934296-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 19, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 966916296