+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 451 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB614ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101583D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor