+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On May 4, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0961)
On April 9, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 961 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB614ER)
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Senate amendments accepted by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senators: Hawkins, Colgan, Potts
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Delegates: Nixon, May, Plum
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
- Senate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 95-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (1-Y 95-N)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 002208868-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from S. T. w/amds (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Presented & ordered printed 002208868