+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Left in Judiciary
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102278D
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2020: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N)
January 31, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jason S. Miyares
Type:
Primary Sponsor