+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 243 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB61ER)
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Privileges and Elections sub-committee: #1 (Marshall, R. G.)
On December 14, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 063523204
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor