+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)
On April 7, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 758 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB61ER)
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 023803856-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 023803856-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 023803856-H1
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub (19-Y 2-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 2
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/13/01 023904856