+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2001 in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 43-N)
- Read third time and passed House (52-Y 43-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 008963816-E
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 42-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended (50-Y 42-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (19-Y 4-N)
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 008963816
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2000: Continued to 2001 in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 43-N)
February 14, 2000: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (50-Y 42-N)
February 10, 2000: Reported from C. J. with amendment (19-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor