+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (88)
On May 8, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1044)
On April 24, 2000 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB608ER2)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (94-Y 5-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (26-Y 12-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV.'S RECOMM. (26-Y 12-N 1-A)
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 5-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (24-Y 14-N 1-A)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV.'S RECOMM. (24-Y 14-N 1-A)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 1044 (effective 7/1/00)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 10, 2000 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB608ER)
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 008948660-H3
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Rec. of conf. report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (88-Y 11-N)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 11-N)
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Callahan, Rust, Stump
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Stolle, Wampler, Houck
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (4-Y 93-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (4-Y 93-N)
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- VOTE: COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE (24-Y 16-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 008469408-S1 (24-Y 16-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Floor substitute printed 008475528-S2 ( Barry, Puller, Sas
- Substitutes by Sen. Barry, Puller, Saslaw void
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 008469408-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Floor substitute printed 009374400-S3 ( Barry, Puller, Sas
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 008469408-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute rejected 008918924-H1 (47-Y 51-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (47-Y 51-N)
- Floor substitute printed 008928916-H2 (Rollison)
- Sub by Del. Rollison agreed to 008928916-H2 (67-Y 30-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 30-N)
- Amendment by Del. Dudley rejected
- Amendment by Del. Williams agreed to
- Amendments by Del. Pollard rejected
- Eng. by House -fl. sub w/amds 008928916-EH2 (84-Y 13-N)
- Amendments by Del. Grayson rejected
- Amendments by Del. Jackson rejected
- Amendment by Del. Bennett rejected
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (84-Y 13-N)
- Printed as engrossed 008928916-EH2
- Constitutional reading dispensed (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (89-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 008918924-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub (14-Y 9-N)
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 007250208
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (20)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: ADOPT GOV.'S RECOMM. (24-Y 14-N 1-A)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 5-N)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: ADOPT GOV.'S RECOMM. (26-Y 12-N 1-A)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (38-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 11-N)
March 9, 2000: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (4-Y 93-N)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE (24-Y 16-N)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N)
February 17, 2000: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (47-Y 51-N)
February 17, 2000: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT (84-Y 13-N)
February 17, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 30-N)
February 15, 2000: Reported from Finance with sub (14-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor